Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Grove Homeowners Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Melissa Mclain, against Tisdale, Sherry L., in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 9
Date: March 19, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 10
Date: March 19, 2018Agreed Judgment      Doc ID# 8
Date: March 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 11Abstract of Judgment to Sherry L Tisdale (eService to Attorney McLain) | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | LettersRequest for Abstract of Judgment | |
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 9 |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 10 |
|
March 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Doc ID# 8Agreed Final Judgment |
|
March 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAgreed final judgment entered. CB | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 7Notice of Hearing | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 5Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Doc ID# 6Final Default Judgment (Returned Unsigned 2-28-18) | |
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 4Return of Citation Issued to Sherry L Tisdale 12-29-17 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.