Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Sade Renee, Powell, Keshun Terrell, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Brown, Sade Renee, Powell, Keshun Terrell, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Letters
Date: January 29, 2020Letters
Date: January 06, 2020Proposed Order      Doc ID# 13
Date: November 19, 2019Order      Doc ID# 14
Date: November 19, 2019Proposed Order      Doc ID# 11
Date: November 19, 2019Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 8
Date: May 31, 2019Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 7
Date: May 31, 2019Agreed Judgment      Doc ID# 6
Date: May 16, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryKeshun Powell appeared on enforcement. Resp not served with precept. Setting passed. cma | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryResp served 2/3 with citation - no precept. cma | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Statement of Inability to Afford Costs Doc ID# 29Statement of Inability to Afford Payment of Court Cost or an Appeal Bond in Justice Court | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 28Request for Process | |
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 27Citation Return for Sade Brown. Issued on 01/24/2020 | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
* Letter - Form LettersCMRR: 9414 7266 9904 2152 4493 05 |
|
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 25Clerk's Contest of Statement/Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs- TRCP 145 | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Doc ID# 26Order on Clerk's Contest of Statement/Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryNo appearances. Passed by Court. cma | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryNo service as of 1/28. cma |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.