Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Westheimer Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Noelle Hicks, against Onyechefuna, Faith, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice Index # 6
Date: December 12, 2018Agreed Judgment Index # 5
Date: February 21, 2018Officers Return Index # 4
Date: January 18, 2018Request Index # 2
Date: December 28, 2017Issuance Index # 3
Date: December 29, 2017Petition Index # 1
Date: December 28, 2017Docket Sheet
Date: December 28, 2017Notice      Doc ID# 6
Date: December 12, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment Notice Index # 6 Notice Index # 6Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment Notice Doc ID# 6Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Index # 5 Agreed Judgment Index # 5Agreed Final Judgment |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment Doc ID# 5Agreed Final Judgment | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citaiton Issued to Faith Onyechefuna on 12-29-17 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Citaiton Issued to Faith Onyechefuna on 12-29-17 |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 4Citaiton Issued to Faith Onyechefuna on 12-29-17 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation - Faith Onyechefuna Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Faith Onyechefuna |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Citatione-ServiceOnyechefuna, FaithServed01/13/2018Returned01/18/2018 | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 3Citation Issued to Faith Onyechefuna | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Index # 2 Request Index # 2Request for Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.