Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Comdata Network, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stephen Harrison Nickey, against Lafleur, Ernest, M & E Transportation Services, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Issuance Index # 14
Date: July 13, 2018Issuance Index # 15
Date: July 13, 2018Request Index # 13
Date: July 11, 2018Officers Return Index # 17
Date: October 23, 2018Issuance Index # 16
Date: August 31, 2018Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 239A Index # 11
Date: May 30, 2018Motion (No Fee) Index # 9
Date: May 24, 2018Default Judgment Index # 10
Date: May 29, 2018Motion (No Fee) Index # 5
Date: April 05, 2018Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 239A Index # 12
Date: May 30, 2018Officers Return Index # 8
Date: May 01, 2018Officers Return Index # 7
Date: May 01, 2018Order Index # 6
Date: April 24, 2018Petition Index # 1
Date: December 28, 2017Request Index # 2
Date: December 28, 2017Issuance Index # 3
Date: December 29, 2017Issuance Index # 4
Date: December 29, 2017Letters
Date: August 30, 2018Letters
Date: June 26, 2018Copy
Date: June 21, 2018Case Information Sheet
Date: December 28, 2017Docket Sheet
Date: December 28, 2017Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 239AÂ Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 12
Date: May 30, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 239AÂ Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 11
Date: May 30, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Officers Return Index # 17 Officers Return Index # 17Writ of Execution Issued to Ernest Lafleur and M&E Transportation Services, LLC on 08-31-18 |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 17Writ of Execution Issued to Ernest Lafleur and M&E Transportation Services, LLC on 08-31-18 | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution -Ernest Lafleur Issuance Index # 16 Issuance Index # 16Writ of Execution Issued to Ernest Lafleur and M&E Transportation Services LLC |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ExecutionE-served to Attorney NickeyLafleur, Ernest Returned Unserved 10/23/2018Returned10/23/2018 | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 16Writ of Execution Issued to Ernest Lafleur and M&E Transportation Services LLC | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution LettersRequest for Execution |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - M & E Transportation Services LLC and Ernest Lafleur Issuance Index # 14 Issuance Index # 14Abstract of Judgment to M & E Transportation Services LLC and Ernest Lafleur (eService to Attorney Nickey) |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment - M & E Transportation Services LLC and Ernest Lafleur Issuance Index # 15 Issuance Index # 15Abstract of Judgment to M & E Transportation Services LLC and Ernest Lafleur (eService to Attorney Nickey) |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 15Abstract of Judgment to M & E Transportation Services LLC and Ernest Lafleur (eService to Attorney Nickey) | |
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 14Abstract of Judgment to M & E Transportation Services LLC and Ernest Lafleur (eService to Attorney Nickey) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.