Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Park At Mission Glen Homeowners' Association, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by J C Jamison, against Parraga, Judith, Parraga, Victor S, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
|
Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 10
Date: February 22, 2018Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 9
Date: February 22, 2018Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 8
Date: February 22, 2018No Fee Documents Index # 11
Date: November 09, 2020Officers Return Index # 6
Date: January 10, 2018Issuance Index # 3
Date: December 29, 2017Officers Return Index # 5
Date: January 05, 2018Request Index # 2
Date: December 28, 2017Issuance Index # 4
Date: December 29, 2017Petition Index # 1
Date: December 28, 2017Docket Sheet
Date: December 28, 2017Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 10
Date: February 22, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 9
Date: February 22, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 8
Date: February 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Full Satisfaction and Release of Judgment No Fee Documents Index # 11 No Fee Documents Index # 11Full Satisfaction and Release of Judgment |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 10 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 10 |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 9 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 9 |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 10 |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 9 |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 8 |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Judgment Index # 7 Agreed Judgment Index # 7Agreed Judgment |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment Doc ID# 7Agreed Judgment | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation Issued to Victor S. Parraga on 12/29/2017 Officers Return Index # 6 Officers Return Index # 6Citation Issued to Victor S. Parraga on 12/29/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.