Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mata, Lesly, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by William R Liles, against Freeman, Richard, Jr, represented by Mai T Tran, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with James H. Shoemake presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 16, 2017 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 9
Date: September 11, 2019Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other      Doc ID# 10
Date: September 13, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Non-Suit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Doc ID# 10Order of Non-Suit |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice and Order of Non-Suit Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 9Notice and Order of Non-Suit |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Shoemake, James H)
Judge: Shoemake, James H |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Shoemake, James H)
Judge: Shoemake, James H |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | LettersLetter Regarding Jury Fee | |
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Doc ID# 8Agreed Docket Control Order | |
February 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 7Defendant's Original answer |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 6Citation Issued to Richard Feeman Jr on 01/10/2018 | |
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Doc ID# 4Request for Process |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.