Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kensington Ravello Towne Court Neighborhood Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Sandy Huynh, against Hooke, Sylvia, Hooke, Thomas M., in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Al-Amin, Taniya presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAl-Amin, Taniya Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2017 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 8
Date: December 22, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 7
Date: December 22, 2022Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 6
Date: December 22, 2022Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 5
Date: December 15, 2022Issuance Index # 3
Date: February 03, 2017DWOP Hearing
Date: December 15, 2022DWOP Notice Sent
Date: November 01, 2022Letters
Date: February 03, 2017Issuance Index # 4
Date: February 03, 2017Request Index # 2
Date: February 02, 2017Case Information Sheet
Date: February 02, 2017Petition Index # 1
Date: February 02, 2017Docket Sheet
Date: February 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 8 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 |
|
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 NEW Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 6 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 6 |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
28*Form - DWOP Order (Blank) Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 5 Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 5Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
458TH DWOP HEARING NOTICE DWOP Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Al-Amin, Taniya, Al-Amin, Taniya, Al-Amin, Taniya) |
|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
458TH DWOP HEARING NOTICE DWOP Notice Sent |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Thomas M Hooke |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | LettersAttachment Letter | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Issuance Index # 4 Issuance Index # 4Citation Issued to Sylvia Hooke |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationAtty BoxHooke, Sylvia Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.