Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Stephen Jones, against Dancy, James, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDebt Contract - Debt Contract |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | OrderGranting Notice of Nonsuit signed 3/6/2019 qc/mvc/st | |
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/OtherNotice Of non suit (stc 3/5/19 sh) |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer/Response(STC 02/16/2018 MM) QC/MM/ja/lb | |
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit4115816 Dancy AFF | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationQC/KL/lb | |
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationDANCY, JAMESServed01/24/2018Returned01/29/2018 | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
4115816-25247111-Unfiled Original Petition-18KGPYvTmwOakxq Original Petition |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information SheetSee Original Petition for Image. | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket SheetQC/KL/lb/ja/lb/mvc/st |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.