Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The State Of Texas, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Fort Bend County District Attorney, against Accredited Surety And Casualty, All Access Bonds, Muharib, Wisam, Smith, Steven Lee, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryJudgment Nisi |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Answer/Response
Date: March 07, 2017Citation
Date: March 01, 2017Letter to Defendant
Date: March 01, 2017Judgment NISI
Date: March 01, 2017Bond Filed
Date: December 28, 2016Docket Sheet
Date: March 01, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
New Doc 2017-03-07 Answer/ResponseANSWER |
|
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationWisam Muharib QC/MM/lb/sh/cc | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter to DefendantQC/MM/lb | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment NISIQC/MM/lb | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket SheetQC/MM/lb | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified MailAccredited Surety and Casualty Returned Unserved 03/13/2017Returned03/13/2017 | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified MailAccredited Surety And Casualty QC/MM/KL/lb/ka/KS/lb | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationMuharib, WisamServed03/06/2017Returned03/07/2017 | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Bond FiledQC/MM/lb |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.