Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Teal Run General Maintenance Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Paul Gaines, against Wiley, Shirley, represented by Gregory L. Cox, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Maggie Perez-Jaramillo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other      Doc ID# 11
Date: October 25, 2017Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 10
Date: October 24, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
M/Summary Judgment CANCELED M/Summary Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Perez-Jaramillo, Maggie) PassedMSJ Judge: Perez-Jaramillo, Maggie |
|
October 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit Dismissed by Plaintiff/Non-Suit/Other Doc ID# 11Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit |
|
October 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 10Plaintiff's Motion for Non-Suit |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Shirley Wiley's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 9Shirley Wiley's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Summary Judgment Proposed Order Doc ID# 8Final Summary Judgment |
|
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 7Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment | |
October 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 6Notice of Oral Hearing | |
January 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 5Defendant's Original Answer |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 4Citation Issued to Shirley Wiley on 01-05-17 | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationHold For Pick UpWiley, ShirleyServed01/16/2017Returned01/18/2017 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.