Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Westheimer Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clint F Brown, against Schexnayder, Mandi M., in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Other Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Officers Return Index # 4
Date: January 12, 2017Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 7
Date: September 05, 2017Agreed Judgment Index # 6
Date: September 04, 2017Issuance Index # 3
Date: January 06, 2017Request Index # 2
Date: December 30, 2016Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5
Date: January 25, 2017Petition Index # 1
Date: December 30, 2016Docket Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016Letters
Date: January 06, 2017Case Information Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016Agreed Judgment      Doc ID# 6
Date: September 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 7 Judgment Notice Sent/Rule 306A3 Index # 7Notice Sent |
|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 7Notice Sent | |
September 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Index # 6 Agreed Judgment Index # 6Agreed Final Judgment |
|
September 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAgreed final judgment entered. CB | |
September 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Agreed Final Judgment Agreed Judgment Doc ID# 6Agreed Final Judgment |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5 Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 5Defendant's Original Answer |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 5Defendant's Original Answer | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return of Citation Issued to Mandi M Schexnayder 1-6-17 Officers Return Index # 4 Officers Return Index # 4Return of Citation Issued to Mandi M Schexnayder 1-6-17 |
|
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 4Return of Citation Issued to Mandi M Schexnayder 1-6-17 | |
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Issuance Index # 3 Issuance Index # 3Citation Issued to Mandi M Schexnayder |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.