Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rivas, Aimee, Attorney General Of Texas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Oscar Trevino, Jr, against Baker-Gomez, Austin Julian, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 24
Date: December 14, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 22
Date: December 14, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 24 |
|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 22 |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Disposing Post Judgment Doc ID# 21Agreed Order in Suit to Modify Parent-Child Relationship | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAtty Trevino appeared w/ Petitioner; Modification Granted; Order Signed - RB | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 20Respondent's Original Answer-Modification Case | |
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Officers Return Doc ID# 19Citation Return for Austin Jaulian Baker-Gomez. Issued on 8/6/18 | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationeServiceBaker-Gomez, Austin JulianServed08/30/2018Returned08/31/2018 | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Process Request Doc ID# 17Request for Process |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information SheetCivil Case Information Sheet | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 18Citation Issued to Austin Julian Baker-Gomez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.