Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Edwards, Lotranda, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joe B. Stephens, against Abraham, Mathew, Sam, Sibi, represented by Michael T Sprague, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Chad E. Bridges presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage Involving Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Docket Sheet
Date: December 30, 2016Certificate Index # 8
Date: February 24, 2017Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 7
Date: February 20, 2017Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 6
Date: February 17, 2017Officers Return Index # 5
Date: February 02, 2017Officers Return Index # 4
Date: February 01, 2017Letters
Date: January 06, 2017Issuance Index # 3
Date: January 06, 2017Issuance Index # 2
Date: January 06, 2017Petition Index # 1
Date: December 30, 2016Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 36
Date: November 27, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 35
Date: November 27, 2018Agreed Judgment      Doc ID# 34
Date: November 27, 2018Order      Doc ID# 33
Date: May 01, 2018Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 32
Date: May 01, 2018Other Disposition/Non-Final      Doc ID# 21
Date: August 14, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 36 |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 306a.3 Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 35 |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Take Nothing Judgment Agreed Judgment Doc ID# 34Agreed Take Nothing Judgment |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAgreed judgment entered. CB | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel Order Doc ID# 33Order Granting Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryUnopposed motion to sub counsel granted. CB | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 32Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Doc ID# 31Production of Certified Copy ($65.00) | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Doc ID# 30Officers 203 Certification of Deposition Upon Written Questions ($65) | |
January 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate Doc ID# 29Production of Certified Copy ($65) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.