Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Freeman, Keith Randolph, Rice, Erica Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Robin L Sowell, S Jan R Cohen, against Freeman, Keith Randolph, Rice, Erica Ann, represented by Robin L Sowell, S Jan R Cohen, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with David S. Perwin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Letters
Date: November 16, 2018Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 239AÂ Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 35
Date: November 07, 2018Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc      Doc ID# 34
Date: November 06, 2018Order      Doc ID# 33
Date: November 06, 2018Motion (No Fee)Â Â Â Â Â Â Doc ID#Â 27
Date: October 31, 2018Request      Doc ID# 22
Date: October 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 39Notice of Change of Address of Jan R. Cohen | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event | No Fee Documents Doc ID# 38Mediated Settlement Agreement Temporary Orders | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | LettersCover Letter | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Test Results Doc ID# 37Drug Test | |
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Test Results Doc ID# 36Drug Test | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
X Judgment Notice 239a Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 239A Doc ID# 35 |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Judgment Nunc Pro Tunc Doc ID# 34Default Final Decree of Divorce Nunc Pro Tunc |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Doc ID# 33Order on Motion for Drug and/or Alcohol Testing | |
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Perwin, David S)
Judge: Perwin, David S |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Docket EntryAttorney Cohen present with Pet, Attorney Barrera present for Resp. Parties by agreement to mediate and drug test for Pet. Nunc Pro Tunc Order signed - by agreement. Order for Agreed Drug Testing signed. dp |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.