Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Elise D Manchester, against Rowe, Christal J, represented by Kimberly Soard, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDebt Contract - Debt Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Affidavit
Date: January 24, 2017Rule 11 Agreement
Date: June 12, 2017Discovery
Date: March 09, 2017Original Petition
Date: December 30, 2016Citation
Date: January 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
order of dismissal Ordersigned 08/23/19 |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion for DismissalWithout Prejudice | |
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Agreed JudgmentSigned 06/14/2017 QC/MM/lb | |
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
20170612_DIS_ROWE,CHRISTAL J_RULE 11 SIGNED BY D Rule 11 AgreementRULE 11 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT (STC 6/13/2017 ka) |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
ROWE,CHRISTAL.PS CERT UNFLD DSCVRY RESPNSES FS.2017.03.09.pd DiscoveryPlaintiff's Certificate of Unfiled Discovery Responses |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer Rowe Answer/ResponseAnswer & Affirmative Defenses (STC 2/9/17 MF) |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
4901263 AffidavitReturn of Service |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationChristal J Rowe QC/KL/KS | |
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | CitationRowe, Christal JServed01/23/2017Returned01/24/2017 | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
4901263 Petition, CIS, Cover Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.