Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rivas, Oscar, Garcia, Lisette, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by R.A. Bement, against Feinhandler, Mark, Diamond, Derek Randall, Amazing Remodelers Of Texas, Llc, represented by Richard E. Brown, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Chad E. Bridges presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 20, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 8Notice Sent to All Parties | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 7Order of Dismissal For Want of Prosecution | |
August 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Non Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridges, Chad) FROM DWOP DOCKET
Judge: Bridges, Chad |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Doc ID# 6Order on Motion to Retain Case on Docket | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Case on Docket Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 5Motion to Retain Case on Docket |
|
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bridges, Chad)
Judge: Bridges, Chad |
|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice SentNotice Sent | |
March 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Doc ID# 4Rule 11 Agreement |
|
December 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Original Answer and Affirmative Defenses Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 3Defendants' Original Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Verified Pleas and Special Exceptions |
|
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Rule 11 Agreement No Fee Documents Doc ID# 2Rule 11 Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.