Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Seven Meadows Community Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brandi J Croffie, against Waheed, Farheen, Punjwani, Abdul Waheed, Occupant Of Property, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Brady G. Elliott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 239A Doc ID# 14Notice Sent to Defendants | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Doc ID# 13Default Order | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
M/Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Elliott, Brady G) PETITIONER'S MOTI0N FOR DEFAULT ORDER OF FORECLOSURE
Judge: Elliott, Brady G |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Certificate Doc ID# 12Certificate of Last Known Address | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 11Notice of Oral Hearing | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Affidavit Doc ID# 10U.S. Servicemembers Civil Relief Act Affidavit | |
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion (No Fee) Doc ID# 9Petitioner's Motion for Default Order of Foreclosure Under Rule 736 | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Citation by Certified MailCMRR# 7196 9008 9115 5580 6040Punjwani, Abdul Waheed Returned Unserved 09/19/2014Returned09/19/2014 | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 8Citation by C/M Per TRCP 736 Service Issue to Abdul Waheed Punjwani (Unable to Forward) | |
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationCitation by Regular Mail Per TRCP 736 ServiceOccupant of PropertyServed09/10/2014Returned09/10/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.