Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Atoyebi, Florence O, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Alex N. Udorah, against Atoyebi, John M, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 10Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Forms Mailed to AustinBVS | |
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Agreed Judgment Doc ID# 9Agreed Final Decree of Divorce | |
January 19, 2015 | Docket Event | Amended Filing Doc ID# 8Second Amended Petition for Divorce | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Amended Filing Doc ID# 7First Amended Petiton for Divorce | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 6Notice | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event | Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Doc ID# 5Respondent's Answer to Divorce | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | LettersForm Letter | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Issuance Doc ID# 4Citation Issued to John M Atoyebi | |
July 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationMailed to Pro Se PartyAtoyebi, John M Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.