Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alvarado-Bartusiak, Barbara, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Jill Renee Vereb, against Bartusiak, Robert Andrew, represented by Wendy S. Burgower, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts with Ronald R. Pope presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2014 |
CategoryDivorce - With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event | LettersUnclaimed Service Paper dated 05-23-2014 mailed to Jill Renee Vereb | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Judgment Notice Mailed/Rule 306A3 Doc ID# 11Mailed to All Parties | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 10Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pope, Ronald R)
Judge: Pope, Ronald R |
|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent Doc ID# 9Notice of Trial/Dismissal Setting | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Entry (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pope, Ronald R)
Judge: Pope, Ronald R |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | CopyCopy of Agreed Temporary Orders Made for C/S | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Order Doc ID# 8Agreed Temporary Injunctions | |
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Pope, Ronald R)
Judge: Pope, Ronald R |
|
July 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Temporary Order Doc ID# 7Agreed Temporary Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.