Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ridgegate Community Improvement Association, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael R. Oneal, against Alexander, Joseph, Alexander, Carol, in the jurisdiction of Fort Bend County, TX, . Fort Bend County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2010 |
CategoryContract - Consumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFort Bend County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2012 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent Index # 6Mailed to All Parties | |
December 27, 2012 | Docket Event | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution Index # 5Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | DWOP Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Shoemake, James H) 12/21/2012Reset by Court to 12/21/201212/21/2012Reset by Court to 12/21/2012 | |
November 20, 2012 | Docket Event | LettersCorrespondence Letter from Defendant Regarding DWOP Notice | |
October 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Letter from JudgeNotice of Civil Dismissal Docket | |
January 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Answer/Contest/Response/Waiver Index # 4Answer from Carloyn Alexander | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Letter from ClerkCover Letter | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CitationPick Up In Room 107Alexander, CarolServed01/18/2011Returned01/21/2011 | |
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event | CitationPick Up In Room 107Alexander, JosephServed01/18/2011Returned01/21/2011 | |
December 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Issuance Index # 2Citation To - Carol Alexander |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.