Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Target National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Boulanger, Michael Richard, against Nogales, Hector M, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with J. Michael Byrne presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 08, 2009 |
CategoryOther Contract Limited (37) - Under 10,000 |
Time To Trial336 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time336 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 253110-Jury Trial; Target National Bank vs. Nogales, H. et al. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
May 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management 248110-Conference: Trial Management; Target National Bank vs. Nogales, H. et al. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
Conference: Mandatory Settlement 244110-Conference: Settlement; Target National Bank vs. Nogales, H. et al. ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
February 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 24 2010 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Target National Bank vs. Nogales, H. et al. Motion OSC Details: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Add'l Description: 2 Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : 2 Filed By |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Target National Bank vs. Nogales, H. et al. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.