Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
De Medina, Ignacia Monsivais, Medina, Yanet, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Victor J Bieganowski, against Arrunada, Gerardo, Reyes, Oscar, Voy Express Service, represented by Clinton V Cox, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Scheduling/Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Annabell) | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition Index # 27 | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Deposition Index # 26 | |
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Index # 25 | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Subpoena Return by Attorney Index # 24 | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Take Deposition by Written Questions Index # 23 | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Take Deposition by Written Questions Index # 22 | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 21 | |
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Supplemental Petition Index # 20 | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.