Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Guevara Hernandez, Valeria Jazmin filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Chavira Moreno, Angel Emmanuel, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Victor Salas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVictor Salas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2023 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas, Victor)
Judge: Salas, Victor |
|
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Index # 6 Order to Show Cause (OCA) Index # 6 (Judicial Officer: Salas, Victor ) Judge: : Salas, Victor |
|
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas, Victor)
Judge: Salas, Victor |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Index # 3 Case Screening Instrument Index # 3 |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseCHAVIRA MORENO, ANGEL EMMANUEL Returned Unserved 01/10/2024Returned01/10/2024 | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing | |
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Index # 2 Order to Show Cause (OCA) Index # 2 (Judicial Officer: Salas, Victor ) Judge: : Salas, Victor |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Protective Order Index # 1 Application for Protective Order Index # 1 |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 4 Request Index # 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.