Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dyska, Sulayka, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Dyska, Dylan Matthew, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with James D. Lucas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames D. Lucas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Lucas, James)
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (2:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Lucas, James)
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Index # 8 (Judicial Officer: Lucas, James )
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 7 (Judicial Officer: Lucas, James )
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Marlene)
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Index # 6
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Index # 5 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Marlene )
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Petition for Divorce Index # 1
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to All Parties Filing Pro Se Index # 2
Judge: Lucas, James |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice to all Persons Filing a Law Suit Index # 3
Judge: Lucas, James |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.