Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Corral, Carla, Montelongo, Silvia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Connie J Flores, against Garcia, Ericka, Lopez, Lorenzo Montiel, Rios, Juan Jose, Saenz, Shane, represented by Clifford R Jessup, J L Jay, Michael G Mclean, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Ruben P. Morales presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRuben P. Morales Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Consolidation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Dominguez, Francisco X.)
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 24 Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 24 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 23 Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 23 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 22 Order Setting Hearing Index # 22 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer Index # 21 Order to Transfer Index # 21 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 20 Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 20 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Hearing (2:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Morales, Ruben) Result: Heard
Judge: Morales, Ruben |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 19 Certificate of Written Discovery Index # 19 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Answer Index # 18 Answer Index # 18 Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Dominguez, Francisco X. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.