Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Trujillo, Ayda Alicia, Trujillo, Daniel Mizcles, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by James B Kennedy, against Essentia Insurance Company, Trail, Sarah Louise, United Services Automobile Association, represented by Cindy A. Izquierdo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2022 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeNotice Of Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Annabell) Non-Suit Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Judge's Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Annabell) Result: Settled
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Index # 65
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Index # 64
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Index # 63
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order in Limine Index # 62
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Jury Trial Index # 61
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Index # 60
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Annabell)
Judge: Perez, Annabell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.