Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2021 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio) 05/10/2021Reset by Court to 06/09/2021 | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio ) | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationMCCALL-MENDOZA, DESTINY SOLEIServed02/18/2021Response Due03/15/2021Returned02/22/2021 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationPATTERSON, EDRIDGE DEIRICKServed02/12/2021Response Due03/08/2021Returned02/17/2021 | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | CitationMENDOZA, CAROLINAServed02/12/2021Response Due03/08/2021Returned02/17/2021 | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3 | |
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.