Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Western Skies Patio Homes Owners Association Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hector Phillips, against Camarena, Adrian A., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Selena N. Solis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSelena N. Solis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2020 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing CANCELED Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solis, Selena) Dismissed Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
February 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Index # 5
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 4
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationCAMARENA, ADRIAN A.Served10/22/2020Response Due11/16/2020Returned10/26/2020
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 2
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Request Doc ID# 2 | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
E-File Event Original Filing
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Index # 1
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.