Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cortez, Layza Lynette filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Cortez, Anthony Joel, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Pelletier, Karen A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePelletier, Karen A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2020 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Sent | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) 04/02/2020Reset by Court to 04/21/202004/21/2020Reset by Court to 07/14/202007/14/2020Reset by Court to 04/21/2020 Result: DWOP
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseCortez, Anthony Joel Returned Unserved 04/22/2020Returned04/22/2020 | |
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: : Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (10:17 AM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Signed
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (1:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Reset
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: : Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: : Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseCortez, Anthony Joel Returned Unserved 03/25/2020Returned03/25/2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.