Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Dewitt, Jacob C, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Selena N. Solis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 27, 2019 |
CategoryDc Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 15 Request Index # 15 Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
AbstractDEWITT, JACOB C Unserved
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost Index # 14 Bill of Cost Index # 14 Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solis, Selena) Result: Granted
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 13 Order Setting Hearing Index # 13 Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Index # 12 Certificate of Last Address Index # 12 Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Index # 11 Motion for Default Judgment Index # 11 Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationDEWITT, JACOB C Unserved
Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 10 Request Index # 10 Judge: Solis, Selena |
|
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Solis, Selena) Result: Set for Hearing
Judge: Solis, Selena |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.