Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Flores, Maria, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Tiffany Nicole Joudi, against James A. Dick Co., represented by Michael Blake Downey, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Perez, Alyssa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Docket Call (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Civil Pretrial Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Final Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa) Reset Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Docket Call CANCELED Docket Call (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa) Reset Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Pre-Trial Conference CANCELED Final Pre-Trial Conference (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa) Reset Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference CANCELED Status Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa) Reset Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
June 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Scheduling Order Hearing CANCELED Entry of Scheduling Order Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa) Submitted Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Discovery Control Plan Doc ID# 30
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.