Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
El Paso Area Teachers Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Angelica Carreon-Beltran, against Dodson, Evan Lyle, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Perez, Alyssa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 8
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (10:15 AM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
May 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Doc ID# 7
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Substitute Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
March 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 3
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Perez, Alyssa)
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Perez, Alyssa |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.