Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mata, Ernestina, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Chris Tamez, against Adams, Darrell Gene, Allstate Texas Lloyd'S, represented by Sean Carroll White, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick M. Garcia presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2018 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed For Want Of Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.)
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 22
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing CANCELED DWOP Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
DWOP Hearing CANCELED DWOP Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Index # 18
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 20
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 19
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Index # 21
Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Doc ID# 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.