Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jackson, Dawn, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Jeremy Sloan, against Zaragoza Hotel Partners, Llc, represented by Eric J. Painter, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Salas-Mendoza, Maria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2018 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria)
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria)
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Other Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria) Other Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Index # 20
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
March 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Doc ID# 20
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria)
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
March 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria)
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment Hearing (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Salas-Mendoza, Maria)
Judge: Salas-Mendoza, Maria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.