Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Auto Fresh Start Finance. Lp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael J Shane, against Chavez, Ricardo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Chew, Linda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeChew, Linda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Index # 15
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Doc ID# 15
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Hearing CANCELED Motion to Compel Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Court Coordinator Discretionary Cancellation Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Hearing CANCELED Motion to Compel Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Chew, Linda) Court Coordinator Discretionary Cancellation Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Show CauseCHAVEZ, RICARDO Returned Unserved 06/14/2019Returned06/14/2019
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice to Show CauseCHAVEZ, RICARDO Returned Unserved 06/14/2019Returned06/14/2019
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 13
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 13
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Index # 12
Judge: Chew, Linda |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 12
Judge: Chew, Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.