Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Jessica A. Riley, against Occupant Of The Property, Ontiveros, Alicia, Ontiveros, Ricardo M., in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Enriquez, Sergio H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEnriquez, Sergio H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Foreclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Return
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.)
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.)
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Index # 10
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Doc ID# 10
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Index # 9
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 9
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Index # 8
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.