Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kazol, April, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Humberto S Enriquez, against Brinker International, Inc., represented by Steven J Blanco, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Enriquez, Sergio H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEnriquez, Sergio H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 28, 2018 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
September 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Doc ID# 17
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mediation Doc ID# 16
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 15
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Enriquez, Sergio H.)
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response in Opposition
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 14
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 13
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 12
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
|
January 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Stay Doc ID# 11
Judge: Enriquez, Sergio H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.