Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sanchez, Juan, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Michael A. Lawrence, against Allstate Texas Lloyd'S, represented by Sean Carroll White, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Garcia, Patrick M. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryOther Injury Or Damage |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Cancelled Pending Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 15 | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Agreed Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
February 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 14 | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Garcia, Patrick M.) Reset Judge: Garcia, Patrick M. |
|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Doc ID# 13 | |
December 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 12 | |
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Settlement Doc ID# 11 | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Doc ID# 10 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.