Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
The Nevarez Law Firm, Pc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael R Nevarez, against Perez, Albert, Perez, Ivonne, represented by Shelly W Rivas, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with M. Sue Kurita presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opinion from Court of Appeals Index # 73
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judgment from Court of Appeals Index # 71
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opinion from Court of Appeals Index # 72
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Index # 70
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Letter from Court of Appeals
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Receipt Index # 69
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Appeal Letter Index # 68
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 67
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return Receipt Index # 66
Judge: Kurita, M. Sue |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.