Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Carrillo, Janette filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Anaya, Rodolfo, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Gonzalez, Jose M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2018 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M)
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseANAYA, RODOLFO Returned Unserved 01/22/2019Returned01/22/2019 | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Jose M )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M)
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseANAYA, RODOLFO Returned Unserved 01/10/2019Returned01/10/2019 | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Doc ID# 3 | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order Doc ID# 1 | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Jose M )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs Doc ID# 2 | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | E-File Event Original Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.