Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Diaz, Ruby, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Diaz, Jorge, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2018 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Conference CANCELED Status Conference (2:15 PM) (Judicial Officer Strathmann, Laura) Settled Judge: Strathmann, Laura |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Result: Granted
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Leverton, Reed )
Judge: : Leverton, Reed |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationDIAZ, JORGEServed03/06/2019Response Due04/01/2019Returned03/07/2019
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Result: Heard
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Setting Hearing Doc ID# 9 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationDIAZ, JORGEServed02/01/2019Response Due02/25/2019Returned02/08/2019
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Doc ID# 8
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.