Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit Doc ID# 7 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Parent Child Relationship Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 6 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 5
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
CitationCHAPARRO, CARLOS ANDEYServed02/21/2019Response Due03/18/2019Returned02/25/2019
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.