Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment Doc ID# 7
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 6
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 5
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationLOYA, MELISSAServed12/17/2018Response Due01/07/2019Returned12/19/2018
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition in Suit Affecting Parent-Child Relationship Doc ID# 1
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.