Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fierro, Sosimo, Jr., Fierro, Maria Teresa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Perez, Charlisa, Fierro, Gabriel, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Anderson, Kathleen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2018 |
CategoryParent Child - Non-Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Parent-Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (8:01 AM) (Judicial Officer Anderson, Kathleen)
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) 03/06/2020Reset by Court to 04/01/202004/01/2020Reset by Court to 05/14/2020
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing CANCELED Final Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) Agreed Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 28 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 27 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings and Recommendations Doc ID# 26 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 25 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Anderson, Kathleen) Result: Cancelled
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 24
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 23
Judge: Anderson, Kathleen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.