Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeDecree Of Paternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decree of Paternity Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
January 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Admissions Doc ID# 6
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Doc ID# 4
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationTALAMANTES, DENNIS Returned Unserved 01/14/2019Returned01/14/2019
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CitationFLORES, CYNTHIA MICHELLEServed01/24/2019Response Due02/18/2019Returned01/25/2019
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Petition for Paternity Doc ID# 1
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.