Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hernando, Jessica Marie filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Holland, Michael Jay, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Pelletier, Karen A. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2018 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | FRD-FEE-CIV | |
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | FRD Civil Payment Plan | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Copy Doc ID# 7 | |
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Information Sheet Doc ID# 6 | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Agreed
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice to Show CauseHOLLAND, MICHAEL JAYServed11/08/2018Returned11/09/2018 | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (1:44 PM) (Judicial Officer Pelletier, Karen A.) Result: Signed
Judge: Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (OCA) Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Pelletier, Karen A. )
Judge: : Pelletier, Karen A. |
|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 2 | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.