Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Parent Child |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event | FRD-FEE-CIV | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Enforce Doc ID# 13 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Status Check (4:05 PM) (Judicial Officer Herrera, Mike)
Judge: Herrera, Mike |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 12 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer Doc ID# 11 | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Regarding Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Doc ID# 9 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.