Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Rodriguez, Antonio presiding.
Case Number |
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationPERCHES, CESAR ANTONIO Returned Unserved 12/12/2018Returned12/12/2018 | |
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Parent Child Relationship Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Antonio)
Judge: Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 4 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationDAVIS, AYANNA LOUISServed07/30/2018Response Due08/20/2018Returned07/31/2018 | |
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | CitationPERCHES, CESAR ANTONIO Returned Unserved 08/03/2018Returned08/03/2018 | |
July 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 3 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Antonio )
Judge: : Rodriguez, Antonio |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.