Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Villarreal, Raul, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Villarreal, Raul, Manjarrez, Angelica, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Leverton, Reed presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryParent Child - Non-Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Parent-Child Relationship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 51
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 50
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Doc ID# 48
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 47
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Enforcement Hearing CANCELED Enforcement Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Leverton, Reed) Agreed Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice to Show CauseVillarreal, RaulServed05/26/2020Returned06/01/2020
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 45
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
CitationVillarreal, RaulServed05/26/2020Response Received05/28/2020Returned06/01/2020
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 44
Judge: Leverton, Reed |
|
April 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Referral Order Doc ID# 43 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: : Strathmann, Laura |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.