Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jo Anne Bernal filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Breitling, Nicole Marie, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2018 |
CategoryDc Bond Forfeiture |
Last RefreshedOctober 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
AbstractBREITLING, NICOLE MARIE Unserved
Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abstract of Judgment Index # 7 Abstract of Judgment Index # 7 Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Doc ID# 7 | |
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Index # 6 Returned Mail Index # 6 Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Doc ID# 6 | |
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost Index # 5 Bill of Cost Index # 5 Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Bill of Cost Doc ID# 5 | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address Index # 4 Certificate of Last Address Index # 4 Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Index # 3 Motion for Default Judgment Index # 3 Judge: Lizarraga, Marcos |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Address Doc ID# 4 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.